+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 69
- Senate Calendar Number 115
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Aging Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor