+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-46
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 562
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7001
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 491
- Senate Calendar Number 309
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 176 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 173
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor