+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 73
- File Number 53
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor