+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-63
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 383
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5880
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 68
- Senate Calendar Number 127
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 221 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Absent: 14
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 128
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (42)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor