+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 188
- Senate Calendar Number 150
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor