+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-98
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 469
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 594
- Senate Calendar Number 300
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor