+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Public Act 13-223
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 682
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 607
- Senate Calendar Number 450
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 379
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 448 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor