+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-23
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
- In Concurrence
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 316
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 72
- File Number 52
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 204
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 13
April 9, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 80 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (7)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor