+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-36
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 538
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 163
- Senate Calendar Number 123
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Vote
March 2, 2017: VA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor