+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-14
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 477
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 527
- Senate Calendar Number 275
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/01
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2017: Senate Roll Call Vote 96 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
March 24, 2017: ED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor