+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-176
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 871
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6551
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6400
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 447
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5895
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 314
- Senate Calendar Number 237
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 484 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 257 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 15
April 24, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 155 PASS AS AMENDED BY A
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor