+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 321
- Senate Calendar Number 168
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor