+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-86
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 582
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on General Law
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 439
- Senate Calendar Number 310
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 279
- Yeas: 131
- Absent: 19
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 277 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (14)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor