+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Public Safety and Security
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 351
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 257
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/17
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsor
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor