+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Special Act 19-19
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 678
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9367
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 137
- Senate Calendar Number 88
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor