+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 483
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 32
- Senate Calendar Number 80
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/04/15 5:00 PM
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/17
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 110 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Housing Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor