+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-50
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 490
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 56
- Senate Calendar Number 105
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 200
- Yeas: 123
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 20
May 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 194 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor