+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-49
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 491
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8539
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 513
- Senate Calendar Number 301
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR PURSUANT TO JOINT RULE 9
Type:
Primary Sponsor