+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 651
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8087
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 135
- Senate Calendar Number 136
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 28, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 296
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor