+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-30
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 553
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 153
- Senate Calendar Number 169
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 183
- Yeas: 133
- Absent: 17
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 211 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (16)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor