+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-85
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 580
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 151
- Senate Calendar Number 167
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 287
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 270 PASS
- Yeas: 36