+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 229
- Senate Calendar Number 115
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology