+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-79
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 618
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7084
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 535
- Senate Calendar Number 393
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 260 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 117
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 12
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 327 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (16)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor