+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 532
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7339
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 412
- Senate Calendar Number 216
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/02
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor