+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 814
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 260
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 231
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor