+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 425
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 209
- Senate Calendar Number 172
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/15 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 88
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor