+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-17
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 601
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7054
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 540
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 761
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 358 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 283 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (20)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor