+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-62
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 551
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6530
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6020
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 480
- Senate Calendar Number 375
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 220 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 200 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 6020
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 21
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 201 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (12)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor