+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-102
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 422
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 19
- Senate Calendar Number 74
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/15 5:00 PM
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/10
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 289 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 10
April 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 84
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor