+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 33
- Senate Calendar Number 94
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/13 10:00 AM
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor