+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 625
- Senate Calendar Number 318
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/17 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor