+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 160
- Senate Calendar Number 122
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/17 5:00 PM
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Vote
March 2, 2017: VA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor