+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-58
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 557
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7973
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 258
- Senate Calendar Number 142
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor