+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 40
- Senate Calendar Number 63
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor