+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-65
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 600
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 149
- Senate Calendar Number 171
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 231
- Yeas: 118
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 17
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 284 PASS
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor