+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 708
- Senate Calendar Number 528
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding