+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Public Act 13-233
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8504
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 672
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 679
- Senate Calendar Number 495
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
June 5, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 391 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 9
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 509 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8504
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 510 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor