+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 417
- Senate Calendar Number 294
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology