+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-125
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 870
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7273
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 377
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5648
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 110
- Senate Calendar Number 137
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 428 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 269 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 130
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor