+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 105
- Senate Calendar Number 72
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor