+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 369
- Senate Calendar Number 196
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: HED Vote Tally Sheet-A
March 16, 2017: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor