+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-49
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 550
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 192
- File Number 186
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 191
- Yeas: 131
- Absent: 19
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 213 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (36)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor