+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-54
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 549
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6716
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 50
- Senate Calendar Number 103
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 203 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 132
- Absent: 18
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 227 PASS AS AMENDED BY A
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (10)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor