+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 701
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 413
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor