+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-48
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 437
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3478
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 154
- File Number 184
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 190 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 9
April 22, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 142 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor