+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-73
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 577
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6615
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 605
- Senate Calendar Number 449
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 245
- Yeas: 141
- Absent: 9
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 235 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6615
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 253 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (14)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor