+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Act 17-22
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8710
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 530
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7233
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 408
- Senate Calendar Number 205
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: CE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor