+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Special Act 17-4
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 528
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 672
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 354
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 7, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor