+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 659
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8752
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 163
- Senate Calendar Number 97
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor