+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-186
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 650
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6748
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Environment
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 416
- Senate Calendar Number 293
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 354 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6
May 23, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 371 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (8)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor